Page: 1 of 6
| [Prev Page]
|
[Next Page]
|
First Page]
|
New Search
Title | Author | Pub Date | Page | Keywords | Recno |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Students vote for Board | May 16, 1924 | 1 | Board of Publications / | 25839 | |
Commissioner of Elections call for petitions | March 22, 1929 | 1 | Publications / Athletic board of Control / | 27602 | |
Gamma Tau Sigma open ticket sales early next week | March 28, 1930 | 1 | Bull Bison / Publications / Gamma Tau Sigma / | 28167 | |
Powerful frames loom in election | April 01, 1930 | 1 | Student Government Elections / Student Commission / Board of Publications Control / Board of Athletic Control / | 28174 | |
New audit committee approves advertising | January 22, 1932 | 1 | Board of Publications Control / Advertising Audit Committee / | 29043 | |
Goplen removed from Spectrum | February 17, 1937 | 1 | Spectrum / Spectrum Staff / Censorship / Editor-in-Chief / Board of Publications Control / Free Press / Free Speech / Goplen, Orville / | 21385 | |
Pete Lewis and George Koch named editor and business manager | April 18, 1941 | 1 | Board of Publications / Lewis, Pete / Koch, George / | 5501 | |
Along with English Department, sponsors essay contest on "The Function of a College Newspaper" | May 16, 1941 | 1 | Board of Publications / | 5533 | |
Board announces Spectrum and Bison heads {photos} | October 11, 1945 | 1 | Board of Publications / Spectrum / Bison Annual / | 5355 | |
Publications delay action | May 23, 1946 | 1 | Board of Publications / | 5384 | |
Board announces publication heads {photo} | June 06, 1946 | 1 | Board of Publications / | 5412 | |
Publication heads named for 1947-48 {photo} | May 08, 1947 | 1 | Board of Publications / | 5442 | |
Editors, business managers of publications announced {photo} | May 12, 1950 | 2 | Board of Publications / | 10474 | |
Editors, managers for `51-`52 Bison, Spectrum chosen {photo} | April 13, 1951 | 2 | Board of Publications / Spectrum / Bison Annual / | 6544 | |
Publications revise old constitution | January 23, 1953 | 1 | Board of Publications / | 6547 | |
Jophnson, Hart edit publicayion; Mark, Roster, business managers {photo} | May 07, 1954 | 2 | Board of Publications / Spectrum / Bison Annual / | 6551 | |
Ostby, Dewey, Johnson, Mark to head publications {photo} | March 04, 1955 | 4 | Board of Publications / Spectrum / Bison Annual / | 6553 | |
Benger, Barder elected publications heads {photo} | April 16, 1956 | 1 | Board of Publications / Bison Annual / Spectrum / | 6555 | |
New publications heads announced {photo} | April 26, 1957 | 1 | Board of Publications / Spectrum / Bison Annual / / | 6557 | |
Publications staff heads chosen for new year {photo} | April 13, 1958 | 1 | Board of Publications / Spectrum / Bison Annual / | 6561 | |
Publications board vetoes application | March 20, 1959 | 1 | Board of Publications / | 6567 | |
Board names Puppe, Quam and Erickson as student publication editors | February 24, 1961 | 1 | Puppe, Gerald / Board of Publications / | 520 | |
Publication board names new editors, business managers {photo} | February 23, 1962 | 1 | Board of Student Publications / | 526 | |
Board names Swanston, Erickson, and Richardson {photo} | February 27, 1963 | 1 | Board of Publications / | 522 |
[Prev Page]
|
[Next Page]
|
First Page]
|
New Search